Governing document SOUTHAMPTON MUSICAL SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1985 AS AMENDED 17TH MAY 1988 AND 22ND AUG 1990, 21 MAY 1992, 13 MAY 1993, 27 APRIL 1995 AND 20 NOVEMBER 1997. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 DEC 2018 as amended on 18 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS; TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS; TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARIABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.