Accounts and annual returns NETTLESTEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 299433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 June 2024 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 October 2023 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 April 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 April 2021 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required