NETTLESTEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a local community hall for residents of Nettlestead and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 09 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN SCHOFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gary Hicks | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Miles | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Johnson-Cruse | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diane Burch | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Johnson | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Hicks | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.09k | £11.80k | £2.75k | £5.37k | £9.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £2.73k | £6.47k | £11.29k | £12.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 October 2023 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 April 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 April 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 5TH MARCH 1968
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING TH CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF NETTLESTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Quarry House
Gibbs Hill
Nettlestead
MAIDSTONE
ME18 5HU
- Phone:
- 07391 096255
- Email:
- NVHbookings@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window