THE ASSOCIATION OF BRITISH DISPENSING OPTICIANS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Teresa Holmes | Chair | 15 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Jill Umpleby | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jude Cody | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Williams | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Cavaye | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Hows | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Matthias | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.85k | £11.39k | £12.03k | £12.33k | £10.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.70k | £14.88k | £9.18k | £6.61k | £5.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2024 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF 10TH OCTOBER 1962 AND SCHEME OF 21ST AUGUST 1989 as amended on 09 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO PAY, APPLY OR APPROPRIATE THE WHOLE OF THE FUND TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST BY DONATION OR GRANTS NECESSITOUS PERSONS IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CLASSES:- I) FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF DISPENSING OPTICIANS LTD; II) FORMER EMPLOYEES OF MEMBERS OF THE SAID ASSOCIATION WHO ARE ENGAGED IN OR CONNECTED WITH DISPENSING OPTICS; III) FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE SAID ASSOCIATION; IV) FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE GUILD OF BRITISH DISPENSING OPTICIANS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 21ST AUGUST 1989
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABDO College
Godmersham Park
Godmersham
Kent
CT4 7DT
- Phone:
- 01227733918
- Email:
- pavan@abdo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window