Financial history TRAVELLERS AID TRUST

Charity Number: 299463
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £33.57k £16.71k £11.97k £140.17k £115.27k
Total expenditure £51.14k £80.02k £40.72k £153.06k £91.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A