THE CANFORD SUMMER SCHOOL OF MUSIC EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist with funding to music students for the purpose of attending summer music courses as provided by the Sherborne Summer School of Music (previously known as the Canford Summer School of Music)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 1988: Standard registration
- 09 November 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | 31/05/2011 | 31/05/2012 | 31/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £528 | £14 | £14 | £14 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £401 | £69 | £67 | £23 | £9.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2013 | 05 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2012 | 11 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 31ST MAY 1988
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OF THE INCOME THEREOF THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE: 1. TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES TO BE AWARDED TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING STUDENTS, TO ENABLE THEM TO TAKE PART IN AND TO STUDY AT ANY MUSICAL COURSE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ANY PERONS FOLLOWING A MUSIC COURSE BY ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH ASSISTANCE THAT WILL BEST ENABLE THAT PERSON TO PURSUE THEIR CHOSEN COURSE. 3. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS INVOLVED IN THE PROMOTION OF MUSIC, OR MUSICAL EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE CANFORD SUMMER SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window