Accounts and annual returns HEALTH IMAGES

Charity Number: 299490
Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required