SUFFOLK MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To aid and improve the condition of those suffering from Multiple Sclerosis (MS), and those suffering other symptoms or conditions which may benefit from therapy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 29 November 1988: Standard registration
- SUFFOLK M S THERAPY CENTRE (Working name)
- SUFFOLK OXYGEN THERAPY CENTRE (Working name)
- SUFFOLK FRIENDS OF ARMS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Mary Moxon | Chair | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Lesley Lock | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Fielding | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Double | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Anthony Glinos | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alina Howlett | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Peter Moxon | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH FLORENCE SIMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.62k | £99.55k | £98.12k | £150.62k | £140.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.75k | £97.35k | £81.94k | £114.45k | £129.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.22k | £800 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED 27 JUNE 2007 as amended on 31 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO AID AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THE CONDITION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM (I) MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS OR (II) OTHER SYMPTOMS OR CONDITIONS WHO IN THE OPINION OF THEIR MEDICAL ADVISORS MAY BENEFIT FROM THERAPY WHICH IS AVAILABLE TO THOSE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, BY (A) BRINGING TOGETHER PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS AND PERSONS INTERESTED IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS; (B) PROVIDING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE AND MORAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT FOR THOSE SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS; (C) BY PROVIDING THERAPY. 2 TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST BY WHATEVER CHARITABLE MEANS RESEARCH NECESSARY TO FIND THE CAUSE, CURE AND PREVENTION OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK, NORTH ESSEX, CAMBRIDGE AND SOUTH NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUFFOLK OXYGEN THERAPY CENTRE
UNIT 27
CLAYDON BUSINESS PARK
GREAT BLAKENHAM
IPSWICH
IP6 0NL
- Phone:
- 01473830359
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window