MUSIC IN MINISTRY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust is the advancement of the Christian faith through the music ministry of Bryn Haworth particularly in prisons in the UK, working towards inmates' rehabilitation through the chaplaincy departments & training others to work in this field. The Trust also supports other charities and individuals involved in prison, mission and aid work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCIS MICHAEL WIRGMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Margaret Whyatt | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Whyatt | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLEN CHRISTOPHER CHERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.24k | £46.95k | £28.62k | £27.27k | £40.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.97k | £39.66k | £42.17k | £27.81k | £42.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH MAY 1988
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. (II) TO RELIEVE POVERTY. (III) TO ENGAGE IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE NO POWERS TO ADVANCE ANY RELIGION OTHER THAN THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 THE SPINNEY
EPSOM
KT18 5QX
- Phone:
- 07867808594
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window