HARROW MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer guidance and support to people with multiple sclerosis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Brent
- Ealing
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 14 November 1988: Standard registration
- HARROW MS THERAPY CENTRE LIMITED (Working name)
- NORTH WEST LONDON MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY ROBERT RIDOUT | Chair | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Adam Gabsi | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Anthony Flanigan | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amit Pindoria | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Farid Kazi | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fotoula Karamouzos | Trustee | 25 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hetal Shah | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Perry | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.94k | £299.77k | £252.54k | £237.46k | £258.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.85k | £239.70k | £223.27k | £274.81k | £302.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.21k | £71.16k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH JANUARY 1988 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 4 APRIL 1988, 27 APRIL 1997, 14 MAY 2006 AND 17 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
TO OFFER GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF THERAPY (INCLUDING HYPERBARIC OXYGEN THERAPY) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF MS NATIONAL THERAPY CENTRES.
Area of benefit
BARNET, BRENT, EALING, HARROW, HILLINGDON, HOUNSLOW, THREE RIVERS, WEMBLEY AND WATFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrow M S Therapy Centre
Watford Road
Harrow
HA1 3TS
- Phone:
- 02084236268
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window