BRITISH ACCOUNTING AND FINANCE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of knowledge/understanding of accounting, finance and financial management, including: (i) the advancement of education in these areas (ii) the encouragement of research in these areas (iii) the promotion by means of conferences, discussion groups or otherwise, of closer relations among teachers, practitioners and others who are interested in the development of these areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 July 1988: Standard registration
- B A A (Working name)
- BRITISH ACCOUNTING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Michael Peter Holland | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Amanda Ballantine | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mark Protherough | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ngan Duong Cao | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Collins Ntim | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Krishnan | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Neil Marriott | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suman Lodh | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.24k | £107.70k | £101.45k | £319.89k | £304.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.82k | £89.18k | £62.93k | £188.59k | £294.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/2012 as amended on 10 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF ACCOUNTING, FINANCE AND FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT INCLUDING: I. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCOUNTING, FINANCE AND FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT; II. THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESEARCH IN ACCOUNTING, FINANCE AND FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT; III. THE PROMOTION BY MEANS OF CONFERENCES, DISCUSSION GROUPS OR OTHERWISE OF CLOSER RELATIONS AMONG TEACHERS, ACCOUNTING PRACTITIONERS, FINANCE PRACTITIONERS, FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT PRACTITIONERS AND OTHERS WHO ARE INTERESTED IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF ACCOUNTING, FINANCE AND/OR FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lytchett House
Unit 13
Freeland Park
Wareham Road
Lytchett Matravers
POOLE
- Phone:
- +44 (0)1202 798537
- Email:
- admin@bafa.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window