Trustees BRITISH ACCOUNTING AND FINANCE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 299527

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Michael Peter Holland | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Amanda Ballantine | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mark Protherough | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ngan Duong Cao | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Collins Ntim | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Krishnan | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Neil Marriott | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suman Lodh | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.