DUMBLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management and operation of Dumbleton Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Harmsworth Cowles | Chair | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Anderson | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Anderson | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Louise Brett | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Thompson | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ruth Seward | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Stanley | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin Phillips-Lamb | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Crowther | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katie Hending | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mercer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.58k | £30.27k | £27.22k | £17.16k | £24.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.52k | £9.87k | £22.36k | £19.72k | £31.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.37k | £14.97k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 23RD JUNE 1971
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DUMBLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dumbleton Village Hall
Dairy Lane
Dumbleton
EVESHAM
Worcestershire
WR11 7TP
- Phone:
- 07525030623
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window