THE ARCHWAY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims to relieve distress caused by loneliness and social isolation. Offers social gatherings and one-to-one support service to those experiencing loneliness. Aims to prevent mental health deterioration affected by social isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £6,591 from 6591 government contract(s) and £6,591 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN TAFT | Chair | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Tarassenko | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Rea | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Davies-Craine | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Fay Gelder | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Hayward Tweed | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Joseph Turnbull | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Booty | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Margaret Alstead | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Priyanka Jha | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penelope Jean Smith | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.87k | £236.02k | £184.45k | £235.35k | £269.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.50k | £223.91k | £216.60k | £214.89k | £227.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.59k | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.50k | £13.79k | £11.83k | £21.27k | £6.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH MAY 1988
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HANDICAP, ILLNESS OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES ARE SOCIALLY ISOLATED AND AT RISK IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Clements Centre
Cross Street
OXFORD
OX4 1DA
- Phone:
- 01865790552
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window