THE EXBURY GARDENS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE OPENING TO THE PUBLIC OF EXBURY GARDENS IN HAMPSHIRE. THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND FROM TIME TO TIME IN FORCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Aspey | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Leopold James de Rothschild | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN LAWRENCE LINNETT | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARONESS KARI DE KOENIGSWARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORD HARRY DALMENY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LIONEL DE ROTHSCHILD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.40k | £182.99k | £183.24k | £108.87k | £88.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £441.74k | £536.26k | £370.53k | £267.32k | £260.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 2ND NOVEMBER 1987 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 1ST JUNE 1989
Charitable objects
(1) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE OPENING TO THE PUBLIC OF EXBURY GARDENS IN HAMPSHIRE. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, KNOWLEDGE AND LEARNING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND (3) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND FROM TIME TO TIME IN FORCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE EXBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Angela Byrne
The Estate Office
Exbury
Southampton
Hampshire
SO45 1AZ
- Phone:
- 02380897181
- Email:
- angela.byrne@exbury.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window