Financial history KING'S CHURCH BISHOP'S WALTHAM

Charity number: 299539
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £82.00k £77.60k £73.65k £83.66k £100.44k
Total expenditure £68.67k £67.71k £73.35k £69.50k £73.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A