SOLENT MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPIES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE THERAPIES- HIGH DOSAGE OXYGEN THERAPY, PHYSIOTHERAPY, OSTEOPATHY, SHIATSU, REFLEXOLOGY AND APS PAIN RELIEF THERAPY TO PEOPLE WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS IN OUR TARGET GEOGRAPHIC AREA. WE OFFER ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND A COMMUNITY BUILDING FOR OUR SERVICE USERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Portsmouth City
- West Sussex
Governance
- PORTSMOUTH FRIENDS OF ARMS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Hayter | Chair | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth William Ebbens | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Silman | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Rickman | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Alexander | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Sandford | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Moorhen | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Emery | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angie Alexander | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHRISTOPHER LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.49k | £69.86k | £95.88k | £146.06k | £147.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.70k | £98.19k | £113.63k | £131.60k | £147.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 19TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
(1) TO AID AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THE CONDITION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS. (2) BY BRINGING TOGETHER PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS AND PERSONS INTERESTED IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 34 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE, EAST SUSSEX AND WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRADBURY HOUSE
56 HEWETT ROAD
PORTSMOUTH
HAMPSHIRE
PO2 0QP
- Phone:
- 02392699116
- Email:
- info@solentmstc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window