THE WYMONDHAM HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society provides an accredited museum with interesting and changing displays of local interest. The society encourages interest in Wymondham past, present and future. Regular monthly meetings are held and a newsletter is published. The society seeks to protect the local environment and the town's conservation area is closely supervised.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 September 1988: Standard registration
- WYMONDHAM HERITAGE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Leslie Hurn | Chair | 22 November 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Simon James Long | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Laura Justina Osadciw | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sarah Rebecca Standley | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Janet Mary Benjafield | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Georgette Vale | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Diana Margaret Grant | Trustee | 25 November 2021 | ||||||||||||
Christopher James Grant | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
PAULINE ANNE CLARKE | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
JANIS RAYNSFORD | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.21k | £23.85k | £12.42k | £23.85k | £23.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.30k | £23.88k | £26.57k | £20.70k | £18.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £417 | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/01/1988 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF OBJECTS, DOCUMENTS, BOOKS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND ANY OTHER ITEMS THE MAJORITY OF WHICH SHALL BE CONNECTED WITH WYMONDHAM. (B)TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC TO TAKE AN INTEREST IN THE TOTAL ENVIRONMENT (GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE) OF WYMONDHAM. (C) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING WYMONDHAM. (D) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATUION, PROTECTIONAND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN WYMONDHAM.
Area of benefit
WYMONDHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wymondham Heritage Museum
10 The Bridewell
Norwich Road
WYMONDHAM
Norfolk
NR18 0NS
- Phone:
- 01953600205
- Email:
- info@thewhs.org.uk
- Website:
-
thewhs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window