THE FORT PITT GRAMMAR SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education. Activities for students. Merits for achievement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Medway
Governance
- 29 June 1988: Standard registration
- 16 December 2015: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- FORT PITT GRAMMAR SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/04/2011 | 08/04/2012 | 08/04/2013 | 08/04/2014 | 08/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.26k | £1.92k | £1.47k | £1.31k | £6.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 April 2015 | 19 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2012 | 07 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH MAY 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL WHICH ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE TRUST MAY:- (I) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. (II) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
FORT PITT GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window