HEMINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is involved in local fundraising events supporting both the village church and local community projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 29 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH ELIZABETH MEASURES | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Stewart Gibson | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Strelczuk | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Clareboets | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terence Webster | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mary Krzanicki | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP NORYL HARKNESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID RONALD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89k | £235.48k | £431 | £2.85k | £4.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.21k | £1.35k | £421 | £3.14k | £7.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH MAY 1988
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HEMINGTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF HEMINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lyttleton House
Hemington
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 5QJ
- Phone:
- 07989556896
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window