Trustees WEST INDIAN SELF EFFORT PROJECT (W I S E)
Charity number: 299558

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Bentley Gordon | Chair | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
June Crowther | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Fisher | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK MCKAY | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Winston Lawrence HENRY | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Chantelle Corbyn-Thomas | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUdith Lockhart | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patrice Thomas | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frank Beswick | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELVA SEALY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.