Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL MASONIC CHARITIES

Charity number: 299567
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 01 October 2020 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required