Financial history BRISTOL MASONIC CHARITIES

Charity number: 299567
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £8.07k £7.38k £9.33k £10.26k £9.06k
Total expenditure £7.14k £11.60k £14.45k £12.20k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A