BRISTOL MASONIC CHARITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing help for the elderly and for local charitable institutions societies and objects within the Province of Bristol as the Trustees shall in their absolute discretion from time to time think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 06 July 1988: Standard registration
- 22 December 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 22 December 2021: Funds transferred to 1190065 FRIENDS OF FREEMASONS' HALL BRISTOL
- BRISTOL MASONIC CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £7.38k | £9.33k | £10.26k | £9.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.14k | £11.60k | £14.45k | £12.20k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 09 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JUNE 1988, AS AMENDED 3 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHERS MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDRE. TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OF THE UNITED GRAND LODGE OF ANCIENT FREE AND ACCEPTED MASONS OF ENGLAND OR FOR SUCH NON-MASONIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS WITHIN THE PROVINCE OF BRISTOL AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PROJECT FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF HOMES FOR ELDERLY AND/OR INFIRM BROTHER MASONS OF THE PROVINCE OF BRISTOL AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHICH AS SOME FUTURE DATE MAY BE UNDERTAKEN.
Area of benefit
PROVINCE OF BRISTOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window