THE NINE MILE RIDE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose of the charity is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: developing effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school; engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wokingham
Governance
- 30 June 1988: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF NINE MILE RIDE SCHOOL (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Neudegg | Chair | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Raubenheimer | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iona Selby | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|||||
louisa Barry | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Eccles | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann-Kristin Berendsen | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelley Richards | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Stockdale | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Lee Lewington | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tim Hampton | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.76k | £8.28k | £11.50k | £20.83k | £18.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.98k | £12.56k | £8.71k | £9.45k | £16.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH MARCH 1974
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nine Mile Ride Primary School
430 Finchampstead Road
Finchampstead
WOKINGHAM
RG40 3RB
- Phone:
- 01189 733118
- Email:
- Fnmrtreasury@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window