Trustees THE NINE MILE RIDE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 299592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Neudegg Chair 23 April 2024
None on record
Melissa Raubenheimer Trustee 19 July 2024
None on record
Iona Selby Trustee 10 July 2024
BARKHAM PRE SCHOOL
Received: On time
louisa Barry Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Kelly Eccles Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Ann-Kristin Berendsen Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Kelley Richards Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Hollie Stockdale Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Stuart Lee Lewington Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Tim Hampton Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record