HENLEY ROYAL REGATTA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In general terms, makes grants to organisations connected with the sport of rowing; primarily for the provision of facilities and resources to enable and encourage young persons receiving education or undergoing training in the UK, to row or to scull.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 1988: Standard registration
- THE STEWARDS' CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR STEVE REDGRAVE CBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adam Freeman-Pask | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Winckless | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR RC STANHOPE | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CL BAILLIEU MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RC LESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.18k | £62.81k | £76.98k | £73.83k | £154.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.92k | £277.75k | £385.69k | £510.07k | £479.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH JUNE 1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES TO ENABLE ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE YOUNG PERSONS RECEIVING EDUCATION AT SCHOOLS UNIVERSITIES POLYTECHNICS COLLEGES OR SIMILAR ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (AND INCLUDING ALSO YOUNG PERSONS UNDERGOING OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM) TO ROW OR TO SCULL THEREBY HELPING TO ENSURE THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PERSONS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS AND THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
HENLEY ROYAL REGATTA HEADQUARTERS
HENLEY BRIDGE
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 2LY
- Phone:
- 01491572153
- Email:
- hrrtrust@hrr.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window