DEVON AND CORNWALL CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF CHINESE LANGUAGE SCHOOLS WOMEN'S GROUP ELDERLY PEOPLE CENTRE ARRANGING OUTINGS AND MEETINGS YOUTH GROUP BUSINESS GROUP LION DANCE GROUP SUPPORT ADVOCACY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 24 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cordelia Wai Yu | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Yuk Leong Lai | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Shei Ling Wong | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.19k | £36.09k | £41.66k | £12.26k | £10.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.30k | £35.03k | £20.15k | £29.70k | £9.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £25.04k | £1.52k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST MAY 1988
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEF POVERTY BY THE PROMOTION OF AN ADVICE CENTRE FOR THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN DEVON AND CORNWALL WHO ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE SUCH AID FOR THEIR OWN RESOURCES; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMU NITY IN DEVON AND CORNWALL; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, LANGUAGE, ART, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS OF THE CHINESE PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
DEVON AND CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
DCCA SERVICE CENTRE
ABBEY HOUSE
NORTH ROAD WEST
PLYMOUTH
PL1 5DH
- Phone:
- 01752266866
- Email:
- info@dcca.center
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window