NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE GUILD OF SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an opportunity for the people of North Hertfordshire and surrounding areas to participate in choral singing. To perform choral concerts at reasonable prices for the people of North Hertfordshire and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 March 1990: Standard registration
- NORTH HERTS GUILD OF SINGERS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JAMES TINNEY | Chair | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE DEAN | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BARBARA CLARK | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE ROWE | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MAY SQUIRES | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE ANN KIRK | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARGARET BLACKMAN | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
DIANE RICHARDS | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE IRIS GOODWIN | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARGARET SALMON | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.59k | £35.17k | £23.46k | £29.91k | £43.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.63k | £27.56k | £16.84k | £26.29k | £40.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH MAY 1988 AND AMENDED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED ON 17 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
I) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHARITY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. II) TO SUPPORT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THROUGH OUR MUSICAL ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.?
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Shephall Green
STEVENAGE
SG2 9XS
- Phone:
- 01438 365918
- Email:
- enquiries@nhgs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window