THE PROMETHEUS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publication of philosophical works; running a platonic education programme from Gloucestershire; organising an annual conference from Gloucestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- Camden
Governance
- 03 October 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY JOHN ADDEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rosalind Diana Pulvermacher | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Geoffrey Ball | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Justine Addey | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brendan Francis O'Byrne | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Briony Jasmine Addey | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harold Adrian Stuart Tarrant | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|||||
James Clarke | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr CRYSTAL JADE ADDEY PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRONWEN AVERIL FELICITY ADDEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.79k | £38.24k | £32.02k | £42.31k | £61.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.56k | £20.53k | £20.81k | £85.80k | £48.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30TH MAY 1986 AS AMENDED 3RD APRIL 1988 as amended on 14 Sep 2018 as amended on 14 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE TEACHING OF ALL SUBJECTS CONCOMITANT WITH A COMPREHENSIVE AND LIBERAL EDUCATION FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF SELF-DETERMINED RATIONAL INTEGRAL AND VERSATILE INDIVIDUALS EDUCATED IN ALL ASPECTS OF MAN'S ART SCIENCE PHILOSOPHY AND RELIGION.
Area of benefit
1. SOMERSET 2. NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Greenways
Lydney
GL15 5HY
- Phone:
- 01594 786235
- Email:
- info@prometheustrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window