Trustees BRISTOL ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 299649

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Norwood | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jake McMurchie | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Dean | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
DARREN BROWN | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Ryan William Parle | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
John William Henn | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Bennett | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Stait | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Gerald Price | Trustee | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALLAN ROBERT MCCARTHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ADAM MANSFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.