CASSL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and assist all members of the Society on all matters relating to their learning, training and professional development and on any other matters which affect them as student members of the Institute; To arrange professional, social and sporting events for members;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 July 1988: Standard registration
- CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS STUDENTS SOCIETY OF LONDON (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ali Husein Mohamedali Januwala | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Junting Jiang | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aydin Bolton | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Krita Shah | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zeying Yang | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.14k | £12.39k | £33.53k | £56.61k | £32.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.44k | £12.31k | £32.94k | £40.61k | £24.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED 23RD JUNE 1988
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS MEMBERS; 2. TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE STUDENT MEMBERS FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, BEING FACILITIES (A) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE BY ENABLING OR ASSISTING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES CONNECTED WITH THEIR TRAINING TO BECOME CHARTERED ACCOUNTS; AND B) OF WHICH THEY HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THAT TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Institute of Chartered Accountants
in England &
Metropolitan House
4 Rillaton Walk
MILTON KEYNES
MK9 2FZ
- Phone:
- 01908248273
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window