Financial history BRACKNELL FOREST MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 299676
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £1.26k £733 £679 £861 £675
Total expenditure £758 £252 £203 £282 £255
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A