Ripple Effect International

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work in six countries in Africa to provide a package of on-going support and practical training over three to five years, including training in farming skills, gender equality, sanitation and money management . alongside the provision of livestock and tools - to ensure that some of Africa's most marginalised people have the confidence, knowledge and skills to help themselves.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£9,002,328
Donations and legacies | £3.15m | |
Charitable activities | £5.74m | |
Other trading activities | £6.54k | |
Investments | £81.93k | |
Other | £26.03k |
Total expenditure:
£8,628,365
Raising funds | £1.25m | |
Charitable activities | £7.38m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £193,741 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.25m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.38m | |
Retained for future use | £373.96k |
People

281 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Burundi
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 25 October 1988: Standard registration
- 05 October 2022: Funds received from 1045672 EMERGE POVERTY FREE
- Ripple Effect (Working name)
- SEND A COW (Previous name)
- SEND A COW LIMITED (Previous name)
- SEND A COW STOCKAID LTD (Previous name)
- SENDACOW STOCKAID LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shallin Chikoto | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karthikeyan Dasari Chinna | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Passey | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prina Rasikbhai Patel | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jeffries | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ROBERT GILL | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Napier | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sarah Brunwin | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Gillam | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.19m | £6.65m | £7.52m | £9.92m | £9.00m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.16m | £6.82m | £7.90m | £8.80m | £8.63m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £819.44k | £677.33k | £2.02m | £427.36k | £193.74k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.26m | £2.98m | £3.26m | £3.15m | £3.15m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £14.69k | £18.69k | £286.63k | £14.57k | £6.54k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.82m | £3.54m | £3.96m | £6.71m | £5.74m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.48k | £308 | £465 | £12.28k | £81.93k | |
|
Income - Other | £96.40k | £109.63k | £12.48k | £32.25k | £26.03k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £288.76k | £335.89k | £676.54k | £317.53k | £598.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.76m | £5.45m | £6.48m | £7.31m | £7.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.40m | £1.37m | £1.42m | £1.49m | £1.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £264.60k | £285.01k | £261.53k | £285.63k | £265.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £297.26k | £342.18k | £172.21k | £321.87k | £569.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £253.23k | £265.17k | £198.66k | £215.39k | £187.26k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.29m | £2.93m | £1.97m | £3.46m | £5.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £413.39k | £1.23m | £587.17k | £980.78k | £3.84m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/08/1988 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/09/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/10/2013 as amended on 22 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE PRIMARILY TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THOSE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE IN COUNTRIES OF LOW PER CAPITA INCOME, PARTICULARLY THROUGH TRAINING IN SUSTAINABLE AGRICULTURE AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AND BY THE PROVISION OF LIVESTOCK AND/OR OTHER RESOURCES. A FURTHER OBJECT IS TO EDUCATE AUDIENCES AND ADVOCATE FOR EFFECTIVE DEVELOPMENT. THESE OBJECTS ARE TO BE PURSUED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND VALUES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD ESTATE YARD
NEWTON ST. LOE
BATH
BA2 9BR
- Phone:
- 01225874222
- Email:
- info@rippleeffect.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window