British Friends of Normandy Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education of the D-Day landings by Allied Forces in 1944 and the subsequent campaign to liberate Normandy, through the promotion of and contribution to the D-Day Memorial Garden and the Normandy Battle Museum in Caen, thereby also commemorating the landings, as well as the historical importance and sacrifices made.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 1988: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF NORMANDY (Previous name)
- The British Friends of Normandy Trust (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Air Commodore Dan James CBE | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Major General Rob Thomson CBE DSO | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Coward | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
VICE ADMIRAL DUNCAN POTTS CB | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRIGADIER JUSTIN MACIEJEWSKI DSO MBE | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Reginald MAXWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEX N SHOOTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243 | £108 | £5 | £377 | £1.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.21k | £1.70k | £1.58k | £2.66k | £3.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 July 2024 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 December 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH JUNE 1988 AS AMENDED ON 16 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION OF THE D-DAY LANDINGS BY ALLIED FORCES IN 1944 AND THE SUBSEQUENT CAMPAIGN TO LIBERATE NORMANDY, THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF AND CONTRIBUTION TO THE D-DAY MEMORIAL GARDEN AND THE NORMANDY BATTLE MUSEUM IN CAEN, THEREBY ALSO COMMEMORATING THE LANDINGS, AS WELL AS THE HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE AND SACRIFICES MADE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rifles Wardrobe & Museum
c/o The British Friends of Normandy
58 The Close
SALISBURY
SP1 2EX
- Phone:
- 02087415593
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window