Trustees British Friends of Normandy Trust

Charity number: 299724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Air Commodore Dan James CBE Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Major General Rob Thomson CBE DSO Trustee 29 November 2022
None on record
Jason Coward Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
VICE ADMIRAL DUNCAN POTTS CB Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
BRIGADIER JUSTIN MACIEJEWSKI DSO MBE Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
Reginald MAXWELL Trustee
None on record
ALEX N SHOOTER Trustee
None on record