THE MORTLAKE CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of education of children and young persons who are resident in the area, in accordance with the principles of the Church of England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £130,260 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 21 July 1988: Standard registration
- MORTLAKE HALL (Working name)
- MORTLAKE HALL PLAYCENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Anthony Hoyle | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY BLYTHE | Trustee | 01 November 1997 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE WOODHOUSE | Trustee | 01 November 1997 |
|
|
||||
ANN MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.49k | £35.17k | £38.99k | £43.74k | £170.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.97k | £38.47k | £24.82k | £29.51k | £135.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £130.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 4TH MAY 1988
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MORTLAKE WITH EAST SHEEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mortlake Hall
Mullins Path
Mortlake
London
SW14 8EZ
- Phone:
- 02088788780
- Email:
- info@mortlakehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window