BRITISH SOCIETY FOR EIGHTEENTH-CENTURY STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Society for Eighteenth-Century Studies promotes the study of all aspects of eighteenth-century cultural history. The society publishes the Journal for Eighteenth-Century Studies four times a year. It organises a major conference in Oxford every January and a postgraduate conference in the summer. It is affiliated to the International Society for Eighteenth-Century Studies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 August 1988: Standard registration
- BSECS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Matthew Laing McCormack | Chair | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emrys Daniel Blakelee Jones | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jon Vernon Stobart | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Abigail Lipsedge | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Williams | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Brycchan Carey | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.37k | £24.16k | £21.52k | £71.87k | £84.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.11k | £79.13k | £44.05k | £91.58k | £86.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JANUARY 1988
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR EIGHTEENTH-CENTURY STUDIES SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF THE CULTURAL HISTORY OF THE EIGHTEENTH-CENTURY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 West Street
Moulton
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 7SB
- Phone:
- 01865279800
- Email:
- secretary@bsecs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window