BREAST CANCER CAMPAIGN

Charity number: 299758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Breast Cancer Campaign's mission is to beat breast cancer by funding innovative world-class research to understand how breast cancer develops, leading to improved diagnosis, treatment, prevention and cure.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BCC (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH DAVID FELTON Trustee 26 September 2024
United Kingdom for UNHCR
Received: On time
BREAST CANCER NOW
Received: On time
BREAKTHROUGH BREAST CANCER
Received: On time
BREAST CANCER CARE
Received: On time
BREAST CANCER RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
Vision Foundation for London
Received: On time
Claire Rowney Trustee 26 September 2024
BREAST CANCER CARE
Received: On time
BREAKTHROUGH BREAST CANCER
Received: On time
Chay Champness Trustee 26 November 2020
BREAKTHROUGH BREAST CANCER
Received: On time
BREAST CANCER CARE
Received: On time
Jill Margaret Thompson Trustee 23 May 2019
BREAKTHROUGH BREAST CANCER
Received: On time
BREAST CANCER NOW
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 06 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 28 APRIL 1988 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 3 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED. 2. THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM BREAST CANCER. 3. THE RELIEF IN CASES OF FINANCIAL NEED OF THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PATIENTS OR DECEASED PATIENTS. 4. THE PROMOTION OF SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS CONCERNED WITH MEDICAL RESEARCH OR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. THE TRUSTEES MAY THEMSELVES APPLY INCOME OR CAPITAL FOR SUCH OBJECTS AS AFORESAID AND THEY MAY CO-OPERATE WITH OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY OTHER CHARITY HAVING OBJECTS SUBSTANTIALLY SIMILAR TO ANY OR ALL SUCH OBJECTS AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON.
Registration history
  • 23 May 2005 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
6th Floor
The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London
E1 8QS
Phone:
03332070300
Website:

No information available