Accounts and annual returns WORTHING SHELTERED HOUSING MINIBUS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 299765
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 30 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 17 March 2005 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required