ARC-ANTENATAL RESULTS AND CHOICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARC provides specialised information and support to parents before, during and after antenatal testing and when an abnormality is diagnosed in their unborn baby. Support is offered for as long as needed whatever decision is made about the future of the pregnancy. ARC also works with health professionals to help improve care in this sensitive area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 August 1988: Standard registration
- 05 September 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 05 September 2012: Funds transferred to 1148653 ANTENATAL RESULTS & CHOICES (ARC) LIMITED
- ARC (Working name)
- S A T F A (Working name)
- SUPPORT AFTER TERMINATION FOR ABNORMALITY (Previous name)
- SUPPORT AROUND TERMINATION FOR ABNORMALITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.09k | £214.78k | £236.44k | £231.44k | £224.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.70k | £168.49k | £197.80k | £157.08k | £200.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 06 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 22 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 04 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 09 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 18 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 19 November 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1988. AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 1993, 21 JUNE 1997 AND 20 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PARENTS WHO ARE OFFERED A TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY BECAUSE OF ABNORMALITY AND, WHERE NECESSARY, TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN RELIEVING ANY MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS SUFFERED BY SUCH PARENTS AS A RESULT THEREOF. (B) TO PROMOTE, OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING, RESEARCH INTO THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECTS OF TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY BECAUSE OF FOETAL ABNORMALITY AND INTO METHODS OF ALLEVIATING SUFFERING ARISING THEREFROM AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window