Accounts and annual returns SAXON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 299800
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 September 2024 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 October 2022 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 September 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required