Financial history SAXON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 299800
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £18.36k £5.41k £23.66k £23.62k £32.38k
Total expenditure £12.55k £5.19k £25.60k £18.98k £46.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A