CHARLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall - used by associated clubs and events held by villagers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 01 August 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY ANNE AUSTIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anthony John Lock | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Ashby | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Brown | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Lidstone | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Anna Maria Westlake | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Eric Howard Brooks | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
REX BROWN | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY WESTLAKE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.24k | £15.84k | £13.73k | £9.06k | £10.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.37k | £16.21k | £9.61k | £14.04k | £9.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 September 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1959
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF CHARLETON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CHARLETON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
POST LABORE
WEST CHARLETON
KINGSBRIDGE
TQ7 2AJ
- Phone:
- 01548531562
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window