TRENCROM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 299831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity makes a small number of grants each year, normally to other charities that are known to the trustees. Please note that the trustees do not generally have funds available to respond to requests for grants from other charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £3,400
Total expenditure: £2,176

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLINE ELIZABETH MATHESON Trustee 09 July 1993
None on record
ROBERT WILLIAM MATHESON Trustee 12 June 1992
CHRIST CHURCH HEMEL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.24k £1.72k £1.90k £2.00k £3.40k
Total expenditure £4.11k £2.96k £3.18k £2.68k £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 JEROME DRIVE
ST. ALBANS
AL3 4LT
Phone:
01727864018
Website:

No information available