TUC AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TUC Aid is a trade union charity founded by the TUC General Council in 1988. TUC Aid promotes education and training, supports sustainable development and provides humanitarian relief and rehabilitative care for people affected by disasters. It also provides technical advice and assistance for trade unions in developing countries and supports campaigns on rights and entitlements of workers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cameroon
- Eswatini
- Qatar
Governance
- 21 September 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Codrington-Rogers | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Russell Secretary | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Grace Olivier Bell | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jo Grady | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Mills | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUE FERNS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.19k | £8.76k | £21.81k | £23.76k | £21.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.59k | £5.97k | £43.79k | £33.03k | £19.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH JULY 1988
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LONG-TERM DEVELOPMENT ASSISTANCE AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY RELIEF IN TIME OF NEED. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION; AND C) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT AND WHICH SHALL BE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND FOR THE TIME BEING.
Area of benefit
DEVELOPING COUNTRIES (SEE PAGE 2 OF DEED FOR DEFINITION)
Contact information
- Address:
-
CONGRESS HOUSE
GREAT RUSSELL STREET
LONDON
WC1B 3LS
- Phone:
- 02074671282
- Email:
- ssukhram@tuc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window