THE RUTH AND HARVEY COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 299837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY EXISTS TO MAKE CHARITABLE CONTRIBUTIONS, TO INDIVIDUALS AND TO ORGANISATIONS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND OF MANKIND

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Harry Grant Trustee
MOSAIC JEWISH COMMUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
MOSAIC REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Received: On time
MIDDLESEX NEW SYNAGOGUE
Received: On time
RONALD LOUIS PRASHKER Trustee
None on record
RUTH COHEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £29.63k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
124 Highfield Way
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 7PH
Phone:
01895633033
Website:

No information available