BAGH-E-ZEHRA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of funeral services and religious burial rites for the Shia muslim community. Muslims from all backgrounds and origins are welcome to contact us. Our burial plots are based in Brookwood cemetery , Woking and Kemnal Park Cemetery, Chislehurst. We hold two large gatherings at Brookwood Cemetery during the year for the rememberance of the deceased and offer prayers for their souls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 November 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAFDAR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASAD SHAIDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ILYAAS BEN AZAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.72k | £47.75k | £176.63k | £132.50k | £114.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.29k | £51.15k | £149.75k | £115.06k | £106.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2022 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2022 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SHIA ASNA ASHARI FAITH AS EMBODIED IN THE FIKKE-E-JAFFERIA AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE SAID FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
68
Queensway
LONDON
W2 3RL
- Phone:
- 07977104674
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window