NEIGHBOURS IN POPLAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides care and welfare to persons in need through the provision of amenities and recreation and leisure activities in the interests of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,417 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
63 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 11 August 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terrence Simco MBE | Chair | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lord Michael Cashman CBE | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Leonard Sabastian | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Blinman | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
jessica darroux | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Campbell | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|||||
shirley meikle | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ali Hussain | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Zacsinsky | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
REMMIE Williams | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mary Monica FROST | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.03k | £245.03k | £298.54k | £288.88k | £339.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.91k | £296.91k | £334.47k | £299.67k | £272.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £122.08k | £140.83k | £125.50k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.63k | £122.08k | £12.50k | £125.50k | £35.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH APRIL 1988 as amended on 01 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE CARE AND WELFARE TO PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN POPLAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES AND RECREATION AND LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NO EXCLUSIVELY, TO CHILDREN, THE AGED AND MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
POPLAR (TOWER HAMLETS BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
113 Poplar High Street
London
E14 0AE
- Phone:
- 02075310910
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window