SEEKPORT LTD

Charity number: 299870
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Distributes Charity to poor people of the Orthodox Jewish faith

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £110,151
Total expenditure: £163,789

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joel Perlmutter Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
Mrs E Krausz Trustee 27 October 2015
None on record
jacob grunhut Trustee 13 October 2015
SERVUS (BENEVOLENT FUND) LTD
Received: On time
TOIRAS MOISHE TALMUDICAL ACADEMY (COLLEL AND YESHIVO) CHASSAM SOFER TRUST
Received: On time
AMHURST TRUST
Received: On time
MEIR HATORAH
Received: On time
SATMAR LIMITED
Received: On time
THE TORAH LEARNING CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £44.82k £56.56k £103.92k £80.95k £110.15k
Total expenditure £35.88k £48.28k £133.46k £89.69k £163.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 30 November 2023 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 30 November 2023 275 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 03 May 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 03 May 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 August 2021 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 12 August 2021 165 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
71 FAIRHOLT ROAD
LONDON
N16 5EW
Phone:
02088003936
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available